HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:07:27

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Rebhekka Fernandez against Ruben Vidal in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1827
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Fernandez Rebhekka
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Vidal Ruben Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL - Ruben Vidal, Ntc of Judgment, 05/0...
5/22/2017: RETURNED MAIL - Ruben Vidal, Ntc of Judgment, 05/...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/29/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/4/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/28/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL Ruben Vidal, Ntc of Judgment, 05/08/17; Filed by:
  • 05/04/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/04/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/28/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 04/28/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/28/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Rebhekka Fernandez against Defendant Ruben Vidal on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Rebhekka Fernandez on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $4,198.25 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $4,288.25.
  • 03/29/2017
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $1.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0010955 (Cash)
  • 03/29/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Rebhekka Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Ruben Vidal (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/29/17
  • 03/29/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $1.00; Balance: $1.00;
  • 03/28/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $5.00; Balance: $5.00;
  • 03/28/2017
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $5.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0010927 (Cash)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Rebhekka Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Ruben Vidal (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009957 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $5.00; Balance: $5.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $5.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009958 (Cash)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --