HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:14:00

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Counts Law Firm Pc against Xiaobing Liu in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1826
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Tony L. Richardson
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Counts Law Firm Pc
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Liu Xiaobing Aka Michelle Liu Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Small Claims Settlement Agreement
6/26/2017: Small Claims Settlement Agreement
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/28/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - No Service
3/28/2017: Proof of Service - No Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - No Service
4/21/2017: Proof of Service - No Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Rejection
4/27/2017: Notice of Rejection
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/26/2017
6/26/2017: Minute Order of 06/26/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/03/2017
5/3/2017: Minute Order of 05/03/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/26/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/3/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
3/3/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) SIGNED BY EMAHN COUNTS, ESQ. Filed by: Counts Law Firm PC (Plaintiff)
  • 06/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/26/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 06/26/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/26/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6
  • 06/26/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Held - Continued to 06/26/2017
  • 05/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 05/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/03/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Emahn Counts; Filed by: Counts Law Firm PC (Plaintiff)
  • 04/28/2017
  • Invoice: Facsimile Filing Verification Fee - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $4.50; Balance: $4.50;
  • 04/28/2017
  • Payment: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Amount: $1.50 Receipt: AH-2017-0012159 (Credit Card)
  • 04/28/2017
  • Payment: Facsimile Filing Verification Fee - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Amount: $4.50 Receipt: AH-2017-0012159 (Credit Card)
  • 04/28/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Counts Law Firm PC (Plaintiff); As to: Xiaobing Liu (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/18/17; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 04/28/2017
  • Invoice: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $1.50; Balance: $1.50;
  • 04/27/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk
  • 04/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Counts Law Firm PC (Plaintiff); As to: Xiaobing Liu (Defendant); Costs: 64.50
  • 03/28/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Counts Law Firm PC (Plaintiff); As to: Xiaobing Liu (Defendant); Costs: 64.50
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Counts Law Firm PC (Plaintiff); As to: Xiaobing Liu (Defendant)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --