HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:07:24

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Mr Boss Inc against Geico General Insurance Company Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1824
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Mr. Boss Inc.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Geico General Insurance Company Inc. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Li Yuanhong
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Request for Court Order and Answer]
6/19/2017: [Request for Court Order and Answer]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Order on Request for Court Order]
7/25/2017: [Order on Request for Court Order]
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Court Order and Answer
6/19/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/20/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request for Court Order
7/25/2017: Order on Request for Court Order
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/4/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
4/28/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/28/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
4/28/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
4/28/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Yuanhong Li (Plaintiff)
  • 07/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/25/2017
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Result: Denied; Result Date: 07/25/2017
  • 06/19/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Yuanhong Li (Plaintiff)
  • 06/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/04/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/04/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/28/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 04/28/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Mr. Boss, Inc., et al. on 03/03/2017: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company, Inc. does not owe the plaintiffs Yuanhong Li; Mr. Boss, Inc. any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: Plaintiff failed to meet burden of proof.
  • 04/28/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Gray Bower; Filed by: Geico General Insurance Company, Inc. (Defendant)
  • 04/28/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Yuan Hong Li; Filed by: Mr. Boss, Inc. (Plaintiff)
  • 04/28/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 04/28/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 03/20/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Mr. Boss, Inc. (Plaintiff); Yuanhong Li (Plaintiff); As to: Geico General Insurance Company, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/10/17
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Mr. Boss, Inc. (Plaintiff); Yuanhong Li (Plaintiff); As to: Geico General Insurance Company, Inc. (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009951 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --