HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:19:10

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Haik T Azizian against Caster Family Enterprises Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1820
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Tony L. Richardson
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Azizian Haik T.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Caster Family Enterprises Inc. Dba A1 Self Storage Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    A Self Storage
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    A Self Storage
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Request for Court Order and Answer]
5/23/2017: [Request for Court Order and Answer]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Order on Request for Court Order]
6/14/2017: [Order on Request for Court Order]
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Court Order and Answer
5/23/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/12/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request for Court Order
6/14/2017: Order on Request for Court Order
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/9/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
5/5/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
5/9/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/5/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/5/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits
6/20/2017: Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 06/20/2017
  • Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits; Signed and Filed by: Court
  • 06/14/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Court
  • 06/14/2017
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Result: Denied; Result Date: 06/14/2017
  • 06/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/14/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Request for Court Order: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed
  • 06/05/2017
  • Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: A Self Storage (Non-Party)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Haik T. Azizian (Plaintiff)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/09/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/09/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  • 05/05/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Brian Darmas; Filed by: Caster Family Enterprises, INC. (Defendant)
  • 05/05/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Russell Biart; Filed by: Caster Family Enterprises, INC. (Defendant)
  • 05/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 05/05/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 05/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 05/05/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Haik T. Azizian on 03/03/2017: Defendant Caster Family Enterprises, INC. DBA A1 Self Storage does not owe the plaintiff Haik T. Azizian any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: Based on the totality of the evidence, plaintiff failed to meet burden of proof. The evidence established that at the time of the auction, plaintiff had paid through November 2014 and defendant had contacted plaintiff on multiple occasions, including with notice of pre-lien and lien, to resolve outstanding account. No provision in the parties' agreement to excuse payment based on plaintiff's condition. Defendant complied with Business and Professions Code.
  • 04/12/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Haik T. Azizian (Plaintiff); As to: Caster Family Enterprises, INC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/07/17; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Haik T. Azizian (Plaintiff); As to: Caster Family Enterprises, INC. (Defendant)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --