HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:23:27

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Jerry Anne Coyantes against Miracle Mile Properties Lp in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1818
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Miracle Mile Properties Lp Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Coyantes Jerry Anne
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/27/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/3/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/2/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
4/21/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
6/19/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 07/07/2017 ; Status Date changed from 06/28/2017 to 07/07/2017
  • 06/28/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/28/2017 ; Status Date changed from 05/02/2017 to 06/28/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 06/19/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Jerry Anne Coyantes (Plaintiff); As to: Miracle Mile Properties LP (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 05/03/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Jerry Anne Coyantes against Defendant Miracle Mile Properties LP on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jerry Anne Coyantes on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $700.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $815.00.; Other: Court makes the following findings: Awarded cleaning fee. Other costs not related to normal wear and tear excessive. Defendant failed to do walk through.
  • 05/02/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Sylvia Hurtado; Filed by: Miracle Mile Properties LP (Defendant)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 05/02/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Sylvia HUrtado; Filed by: Miracle Mile Properties LP (Defendant)
  • 03/27/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Jerry Anne Coyantes (Plaintiff); As to: Miracle Mile Properties LP (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/21/17
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009942 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jerry Anne Coyantes (Plaintiff); As to: Miracle Mile Properties LP (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --