HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:19:07

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Cesar Raygoza against Eunice Russell in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1816
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Tony L. Richardson
  • Courthouse

    Pasadena Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Russell Eunice Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Raygoza Cesar
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Raygoza Landscaping Inc.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
7/10/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
  Free
Download
[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
7/10/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarat...
  Free
Download
(Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
8/30/2017: (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  Free
Download
Unknown
9/18/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/19/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/24/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
7/10/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Postponement
5/5/2017: Notice of Postponement
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
7/3/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/01...
9/1/2017: Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/01...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
6/28/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
(case #16ahsc01267)
10/10/2017: (case #16ahsc01267)
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • Notice of Related Case (case #16ahsc01267); Filed by: Eunice Russell (Defendant)
  • 09/19/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/19/2017
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A; Reason: Inventory Transfer
  • 09/19/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/18/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Denial of Motion to Vacate; Filed by: Eunice Russell (Defendant)
  • 09/18/2017
  • Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Denial of Motion to Vacate scheduled for 11/09/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A
  • 09/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 09/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/30/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 08/30/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 08/30/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 08/22/2017
  • Other - $15.00 Check, Attachments, Small Claims Subpoena and Declaration - Contractor's State License Board - $40.00 (Waived); Filed by: Eunice Russell (Defendant)
  • 07/10/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees
  • 07/10/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: As to: Eunice Russell (Defendant)
  • 07/10/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/10/2017
  • 07/10/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Eunice Russell (Defendant)
  • 07/10/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0014833 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 07/10/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 07/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/03/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/28/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --