HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:23:15

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Lian Shou Liln against Manli Xu in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1815
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Tony L. Richardson
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Huang Yulian
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Xu Manli Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Liln Lian Shou
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Lin Lian Shou
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    He Shaohua Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/17/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Cla...
7/18/2017: Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Cl...
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request for Court Order - Re: request to ...
7/13/2017: Order on Request for Court Order - Re: request to...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Rejection
7/17/2017: Notice of Rejection
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/18/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
7/12/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/02/2017
5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
5/18/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for...
8/23/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order fo...
  Fees Apply
Download
Application and Order to Produce Statement of Asse...
7/10/2017: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Ass...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
  • 08/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 08/23/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/23/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 08/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 08/23/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/18/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/18/2017 ; Status Date changed from 05/18/2017 to 08/18/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 08/17/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Lian Shou Lin (Plaintiff); Yulian Huang (Plaintiff); As to: Manli Xu (Defendant); Shaohua He (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 07/28/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL Manli Xu, SC105A, 07/28/17; Filed by: As to: Manli Xu (Defendant)
  • 07/25/2017
  • Address for Shaohua He (Defendant) updated
  • 07/24/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL Shaoahua He, SC105A, 07/14/17. Re-sent to address from the USPS. Filed by: As to: Shaohua He (Defendant)
  • 07/18/2017
  • Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: As to: Manli Xu (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/12/17
  • 07/17/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/14/2017
  • Address for Manli Xu (Defendant) updated
  • 07/14/2017
  • Updated -- Shaohua He (Defendant): Last Name changed from he to He
  • 07/13/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order Re: request to file a late Appeal. The request is denied. Filed by:
  • 07/13/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Request for Court Order Re: request to file a late Appeal. The request is denied.: Result: Denied; Result Date: 07/13/2017
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Manli Xu (Defendant); Shaohua he (Defendant)
  • 07/12/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Appeal - Notice of appeal of small claim- CCP 116.760; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0014958 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 07/10/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: Lian Shou Lin (Plaintiff); As to: Manli Xu (Defendant)
  • 07/10/2017
  • Invoice: Motion Fee- GC 70617 (a)(3)(6)(7); CCP 116.820; Fee: $60.00; Payment: 60.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0014843 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 07/10/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 08/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 05/18/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --