This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 12:04:04 (UTC).

MAYRA AGUILERA VS LISA LIRA

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 MAYRA AGUILERA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LISA LIRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1813

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUILERA MAYRA

Baldwin Park, CA 91706

Defendant

LIRA LISA

Baldwin Park, CA 91706

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 12/15/2017

12/15/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 12/15/2017

(Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

12/15/2017: (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

(Order for Examination)

11/9/2017: (Order for Examination)

Unknown

10/6/2017: Unknown

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/16/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/23/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

6/22/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 04/28/2017

4/28/2017: Minute Order of 04/28/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/28/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 12/15/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 12/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 12/15/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim (Order for Examination); Filed by: As to: Lisa Lira (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: Mayra Aguilera (Plaintiff); As to: Lisa Lira (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 12/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/28/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Held - Continued to 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Mayra Aguilera (Plaintiff); As to: Lisa Lira (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Mayra Aguilera (Plaintiff); As to: Lisa Lira (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009937 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less