HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:18:58

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Rosalba Contreras against Mike Seif in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1809
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Pasadena Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Seif Mike Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Ganceda Rogelio
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Contreras Rosalba
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2017 and Ju...
8/14/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2017 and J...
  Free
Download
by Marina Papikian
8/14/2017: by Marina Papikian
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/2/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/6/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/6/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/8/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/28/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/28/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/23/2017
6/23/2017: Minute Order of 06/23/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
(Non-Jury Trial)
8/14/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/08/2017
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A; Reason: Inventory Transfer
  • 09/06/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Mike Seif (Defendant)
  • 09/06/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 11/03/2017 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A
  • 09/06/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/28/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/14/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 08/14/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/14/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Rosalba Contreras and Plaintiff Rogelio Ganceda against Defendant Mike Seif on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Rosalba Contreras, et al. on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $2,700.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $2,790.00.; Other: Defendant wrongfully and in bad faith withheld Plaintiffs' security deposit of $900.00
  • 08/14/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Marina Papikian; Filed by: Mike Seif (Defendant)
  • 08/02/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rosalba Contreras (Plaintiff); Rogelio Ganceda (Plaintiff); As to: Mike Seif (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/20/17; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 06/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/23/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Held - Continued to 08/14/2017
  • 06/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/14/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 06/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/23/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/28/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Rogelio Ganceda (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 04/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 04/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/23/2017
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --