HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:22:55

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Alicia Kruger against Daniel Bauer in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1808
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Bauer Daniel Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Kruger Alicia
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
7/31/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/10/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
5/1/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/2/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/1/2017: Minute Order of 05/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • Updated -- Declaration of Judgment Debtor Regarding Satisfaction of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Satisfied
  • 09/18/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 09/18/2017 ; Status Date changed from 08/10/2017 to 09/18/2017
  • 09/18/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 09/18/2017 ; Status Date changed from 09/18/2017 to 09/18/2017
  • 08/10/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/10/2017 ; Status Date changed from 05/01/2017 to 08/10/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 07/31/2017
  • Declaration of Judgment Debtor Regarding Satisfaction of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Daniel Bauer (Defendant); Satisfied: No
  • 05/11/2017
  • Invoice: Sheriff?s Recovery Fee; Fee: $40.00; Balance: $40.00;
  • 05/11/2017
  • Payment: Sheriff?s Recovery Fee; Amount: $40.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0012554 (Credit Card)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/01/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 05/01/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/01/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Alicia Kruger against Defendant Daniel Bauer on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Alicia Kruger on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $50.00 and costs of $40.00 for a total of $90.00.; Other: COURT FINDS: Plaintiff had a bath accessible to her but chose to join a health club and accept Defendant's ill conceived offer to allow her to move out or receive a daily rent credit of 19.16 for 22 days. It is fairly apparent that Defendant's offer was mistakenly made in the alternative. Plaintiff received the benefit of all the amenities of her premises with the exception of the shower and her own decision not to use one of the other showers on the premises available to her. Instead, she chose to join a health club and shower there.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $40.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Daniel Bauer. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will no...
  • 05/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/10/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Alicia Kruger (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Bauer (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 03/08/17
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009928 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Alicia Kruger (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Bauer (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Alicia Kruger (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Alicia Kruger (Plaintiff)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --