HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:22:45

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by American Auto Financing Inc against Veronica Valdez Palacios in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1805
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Tony L. Richardson
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    American Auto Financing Inc
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Palacios Veronica Valdez Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Moreno Omar Pliego Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

by Esmeralda Melgar
7/21/2017: by Esmeralda Melgar
  Fees Apply
Download
[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
5/24/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarat...
  Fees Apply
Download
Small Claims Settlement Agreement
7/21/2017: Small Claims Settlement Agreement
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/28/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/28/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/15/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
5/24/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/4/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/4/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/4/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 07/21/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/21/2017
  • 07/21/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 07/21/2017
  • 07/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/21/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/21/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 07/21/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/21/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6
  • 07/21/2017
  • Updated -- On the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by American Auto Financing Inc on 03/15/2017, judgment entered on 05/04/2017 is vacated
  • 07/21/2017
  • On the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by American Auto Financing Inc on 03/15/2017, judgment entered on 05/04/2017 as to Omar Pliego Moreno is vacated
  • 07/21/2017
  • On the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by American Auto Financing Inc on 03/15/2017, judgment entered on 05/04/2017 as to Veronica Valdez Palacios is vacated
  • 07/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Esmeralda Melgar; Filed by: American Auto Financing Inc (Plaintiff)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Omar Pliego Moreno (Defendant)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0013064 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 05/24/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 05/24/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 05/04/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/04/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff American Auto Financing Inc against Defendant Omar Pliego Moreno; Defendant Veronica Valdez Palacios on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by American Auto Financing Inc on 03/15/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $180.00 for a total of $2,680.00, joint and several.
  • 05/04/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Esmeralda Melgar; Filed by: American Auto Financing Inc (Plaintiff)
  • 05/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/04/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --