HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:22:38

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Shaundra Marie Reahle against Juana Ramirez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1803
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Tony L. Richardson
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Reahle Shaundra Marie
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Ramirez Juana Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/2/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/3/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Postponement
5/2/2017: Notice of Postponement
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/23/2017
6/23/2017: Minute Order of 06/23/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/23/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 06/23/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/23/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 05/02/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Shaundra Marie Reahle (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/23/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Shaundra Marie Reahle (Plaintiff); As to: Juana Ramirez (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Shaundra Marie Reahle (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Shaundra Marie Reahle (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009923 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --