HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:18:42

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Joaquin Hernandez Martinez against Trans Atlantic Imports Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1795
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Pasadena Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Trans Atlantic Import Inc. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Martinez Joaquin Hernandez
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Trans Atlantic Imports Inc. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

by Manouk Mesropyan
7/27/2017: by Manouk Mesropyan
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/28/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/1/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/28/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/28/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/10/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
6/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
7/3/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
7/3/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
6/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
4/10/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
(Ruling on Submitted Matter)
7/31/2017: (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Trans Atlantic Imports Inc. (Defendant)
  • 08/28/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/28/2017
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A; Reason: Inventory Transfer
  • 08/28/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 10/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A
  • 08/28/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/01/2017
  • Updated -- Trans Atlantic Imports Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Trans Atlantic Import Inc. to Trans Atlantic Imports Inc.
  • 08/01/2017
  • ** Case Name changed from JOAQUIN HERNANDEZ MARTINEZ vs TRANS ATLANTIC IMPORT INC. to JOAQUIN HERNANDEZ MARTINEZ vs TRANS ATLANTIC IMPORTS INC.
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/31/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 07/31/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Joaquin Hernandez Martinez against Defendant Trans Atlantic Imports Inc. on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Joaquin Hernandez Martinez on 04/10/2017 for the principal amount of $7,500.00 and costs of $121.20 for a total of $7,621.20.
  • 07/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 07/27/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 07/27/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Manouk Mesropyan; Filed by: Trans Atlantic Imports Inc. (Defendant)
  • 07/03/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Joaquin Hernandez Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Trans Atlantic Import Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 52.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/25/17
  • 07/03/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Joaquin Hernandez Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Trans Atlantic Import Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 52.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/25/17
  • 06/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Joaquin Hernandez Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Trans Atlantic Import Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 51.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/14/17
  • 06/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Joaquin Hernandez Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Trans Atlantic Import Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 46.20; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/14/17
  • 06/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 07/27/2017
  • 06/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 04/10/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Joaquin Hernandez Martinez (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --