HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:18:39

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Evangeline Nebedum against Osvaldo Pinedo Mr in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1794
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Tony L. Richardson
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Nebedum Evangeline
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Nebedum Edward
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Pineda Osvaldo Mr. Aka Lalo Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Pinedo Mr. Osvaldo Aka Lalo Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Pinedo Osvaldo Mr. Aka Lalo Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/24/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/3/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2017
  • Updated -- Mr. Osvaldo Pinedo (Defendant): First Name changed from Osvaldo to Mr. Osvaldo; Name Suffix: blank
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 05/02/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/02/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Evangeline Nebedum; Plaintiff Edward Nebedum against Defendant Mr. Osvaldo Pinedo AKA Lalo on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Evangeline Nebedum, et al. on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $95.00 for a total of $5,095.00.
  • 03/24/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Evangeline Nebedum (Plaintiff); Edward Nebedum (Plaintiff); As to: Osvaldo Pinedo, Mr. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/23/17; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/06/2017
  • Updated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Status Date changed from 03/02/2017 to 03/06/2017
  • 03/06/2017
  • ** Case Name changed from EVANGELINE NEBEDUM, et al. vs OSVALDO PINEDA, MR. to EVANGELINE NEBEDUM, et al. vs OSVALDO PINEDO, MR.
  • 03/06/2017
  • Updated -- Osvaldo Pinedo, Mr. (Defendant): Last Name changed from Pineda to Pinedo
  • 03/06/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Status Date changed from 03/02/2017 to 03/06/2017
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Evangeline Nebedum (Plaintiff); Edward Nebedum (Plaintiff); As to: Osvaldo Pineda, Mr. (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009907 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Evangeline Nebedum (Plaintiff); Edward Nebedum (Plaintiff); As to: Osvaldo Pinedo, Mr. (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Status Date changed from 03/06/2017 to 03/02/2017
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --