HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:18:35

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Phillips Meadows Hoa against George Martinez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1792
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Meadows Phillip
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Martinez George Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Philips Meadows Hoa
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 07/10/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
7/10/2017: Minute Order of 07/10/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
Unknown
8/1/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/1/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/25/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/9/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
7/11/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/27/2017
4/27/2017: Minute Order of 04/27/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
7/10/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
4/27/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2017
  • Address for Philips Meadows HOA (Plaintiff) customer request
  • 10/10/2017
  • Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Philips Meadows HOA (Plaintiff); George Martinez (Defendant)
  • 10/10/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Philips Meadows HOA (Plaintiff)
  • 09/25/2017
  • Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/25/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 10/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department NE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 10/10/2017 08:30 AM at 10/10/2017 8:30 AM Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal in Department A
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: George Martinez (Defendant)
  • 08/01/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 10/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/11/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/10/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 07/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/10/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/10/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Philips Meadows HOA against Defendant George Martinez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Phillip Meadows on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $4,806.90 and costs of $125.00 for a total of $4,931.90.
  • 06/22/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Kristin Shabinaw; Filed by: Philips Meadows HOA (Plaintiff)
  • 06/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 06/22/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 RES to 06/22/2017
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 04/27/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Robert P. Remley; Filed by: Philips Meadows HOA (Plaintiff)
  • 04/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/27/2017; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --