HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:18:32

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by April Kane against Arturo Arellano Junior in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1791
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Kane April
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Arellano Arturo Junior Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Arellano Arturo Jr. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/13/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
RETURNED MAIL - April Kane, Ntc of Judgment, 06/12...
6/19/2017: RETURNED MAIL - April Kane, Ntc of Judgment, 06/1...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/3/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Postponement
4/14/2017: Notice of Postponement
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/8/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Motion for Change of Venue
5/4/2017: Motion for Change of Venue
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
6/8/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/8/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL April Kane, Ntc of Judgment, 06/12/17; Filed by:
  • 06/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/08/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/08/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 06/08/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 06/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 06/08/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/08/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by April Kane on 03/02/2017: Defendant Arturo Arellano JR. does not owe the plaintiff April Kane any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: Plaintiff submitted an altered document and represented under oath that it was her contract with defendant. Defendant had a copy of the actual contract and comparing it to the copy submitted by plaintiff, it was apparent that plaintiff's copy had been altered after the fact to falsely represent that the contract price was $2,500.00 instead of $500.00.
  • 05/04/2017
  • Motion for Change of Venue; Filed by: Arturo Arellano, Junior (Defendant)
  • 04/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/08/2017
  • 04/14/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk
  • 04/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/08/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 04/13/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Arturo Arellano, Junior (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
  • 04/13/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0011522 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 04/13/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/13/2017
  • 04/03/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: April Kane (Plaintiff); As to: Arturo Arellano, Junior (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/30/17; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: April Kane (Plaintiff); As to: Arturo Arellano, Junior (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009895 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --