HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:18:25

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Raul Perez against A Fanticola Co Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1788
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Tony L. Richardson
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Perez Raul
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    A Fanticola Co Inc Dba Jiffy Lube Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/18/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/1/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions
7/6/2017: Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
5/1/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/1/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2017
  • Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/01/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Raul Perez against Defendant A Fanticola Co Inc DBA Jiffy Lube on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Raul Perez on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $1,647.97 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $1,737.97.
  • 05/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by John Banh; Filed by: A Fanticola Co Inc (Defendant)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 05/01/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 05/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/18/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Raul Perez (Plaintiff); As to: A Fanticola Co Inc (Defendant); Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/11/17
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Raul Perez (Plaintiff); As to: A Fanticola Co Inc (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009886 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --