HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:22:00

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Monica Clements against Raul Silva Jr - Junior in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1787
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Contreras Enrique
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Clements Monica
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Contreras Marissa
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Silva Raul Jr. - Junior Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Silva Raul Jr. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment]
7/19/2017: [Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian...
3/14/2017: [Application And Order For Appointment of Guardia...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/6/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
4/28/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/4/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
4/28/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for...
9/8/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for...
  Fees Apply
Download
Application and Order to Produce Statement of Asse...
7/20/2017: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Ass...
  Fees Apply
Download
Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian ...
3/7/2017: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian ...
3/7/2017: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian ...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
  • 09/08/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 09/08/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/08/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 09/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 09/08/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/24/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 09/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 07/24/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/20/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/20/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court): Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/20/2017
  • 07/20/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/20/2017
  • 07/20/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/20/2017
  • 07/20/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Issued and Filed by: Monica Clements (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Silva, JR. (Defendant)
  • 07/19/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees
  • 07/19/2017
  • Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court)
  • 07/19/2017
  • Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Raul Silva, JR. (Defendant)
  • 07/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/04/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/28/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/28/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 04/28/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 04/28/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 04/28/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --