HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:21:49

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Daniel Estrada against Freddy Hugo Gonzalez Martinez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1784
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Estrada Daniel
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Sanchez Jessica
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Martinez Freddy Hugo Gonzalez Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/2/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/6/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
4/27/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
4/27/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for...
9/18/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order fo...
  Fees Apply
Download
(Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance a...
9/18/2017: (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance ...
  Fees Apply
Download
$40.00
9/11/2017: $40.00
  Fees Apply
Download
$40.00
9/8/2017: $40.00
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
  • 09/18/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 09/18/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/18/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 09/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 09/18/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 09/11/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service $40.00; Filed by:
  • 09/08/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service $40.00; Filed by:
  • 08/02/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: Daniel Estrada (Plaintiff); Jessica Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Freddy Hugo Gonzalez Martinez (Defendant)
  • 08/02/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 09/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 04/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/27/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/27/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/27/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 04/27/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/27/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Daniel Estrada; Plaintiff Jessica Sanchez against Defendant Freddy Hugo Gonzalez Martinez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Daniel Estrada, et al. on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $5,075.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $75.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Freddy Hugo Gonzalez Martinez. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government ...
  • 04/06/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Daniel Estrada (Plaintiff); Jessica Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Freddy Hugo Gonzalez Martinez (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/04/17
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Daniel Estrada (Plaintiff); Jessica Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Freddy Hugo Gonzalez Martinez (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 03/02/2017 to 03/02/2017
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Daniel Estrada (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Daniel Estrada (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jessica Sanchez (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jessica Sanchez (Plaintiff)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --