HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:21:46

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Elizabeth G Padgett against Robert Naughton in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1783
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Padgett Elizabeth G.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Naughton Debbie Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Naughton Robert Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Small Claims Settlement Agreement
4/27/2017: Small Claims Settlement Agreement
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/6/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/27/2017
4/27/2017: Minute Order of 04/27/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6
  • 04/27/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/27/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/27/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 04/27/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/06/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Elizabeth G. Padgett (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Naughton (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/29/17; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Elizabeth G. Padgett (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Naughton (Defendant); Debbie Naughton (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009874 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --