HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:18:21

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Marylou Alva against Johanne Gutierrez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1782
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Gutierrez Johanne Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Alva Marylou
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Gutierrez Joanna Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Gutierrez Johanna Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 06/30/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
6/30/2017: Minute Order of 06/30/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/5/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
RETURNED MAIL - Joanna Gutierrez, Minute order, 05...
5/19/2017: RETURNED MAIL - Joanna Gutierrez, Minute order, 0...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
4/4/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/30/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/10/2017
5/10/2017: Minute Order of 05/10/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/30/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/10/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Brief (name extension) - Plaintiff's Trial Brief
6/28/2017: Brief (name extension) - Plaintiff's Trial Brief
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/30/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/30/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/30/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/30/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/30/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 06/30/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/30/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Marylou Alva against Defendant Joanna Gutierrez on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (2nd) filed by Marylou Alva on 04/04/2017 for the principal amount of $2,397.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $2,487.00.
  • 06/28/2017
  • Brief Plaintiff's Trial Brief; Filed by: Marylou Alva (Plaintiff)
  • 05/19/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL Joanna Gutierrez, Minute order, 05/12/17, sent to 2nd address on POS; Filed by:
  • 05/10/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/10/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/10/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Held - Continued to 06/30/2017
  • 05/10/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/30/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 05/05/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0012344 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 05/05/2017
  • Payment: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Amount: $1.50 Receipt: AH-2017-0012344 (Credit Card)
  • 05/05/2017
  • Invoice: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $1.50; Balance: $1.50;
  • 05/05/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Marylou Alva (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
  • 04/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Marylou Alva (Plaintiff); As to: Joanna Gutierrez (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/04/17
  • 04/04/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Marylou Alva (Plaintiff); As to: Joanna Gutierrez (Defendant)
  • 03/06/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Marylou Alva (Plaintiff); As to: Johanna Gutierrez (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Marylou Alva (Plaintiff); As to: Johanne Gutierrez (Defendant)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --