HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:21:36

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Motorist Acceptance Corp against Jeremiah La Croix in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1780
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Tony L. Richardson
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Motorist Acceptance Corp. Dba Saddleback Acceptance Corp
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Croix Jeremiah La Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    La Croix Jeremiah Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
9/13/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Small Claims Settlement Agreement
5/8/2017: Small Claims Settlement Agreement
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/16/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/8/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/08/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/8/2017: Minute Order of 05/08/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/8/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/8/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Motorist Acceptance Corp. (Plaintiff)
  • 05/08/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/08/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/08/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 05/08/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/08/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Motorist Acceptance Corp. DBA Saddleback Acceptance Corp against Defendant Jeremiah La Croix on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Motorist Acceptance Corp. on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $85.00 for a total of $2,585.00.; Defendant shall pay $150.00 on or before 05/22/2017. Payments are to be made at the rate of $150.00 per month, beginning on 05/22/2017 and on 22nd of each month thereafter until paid in full. If any payment is missed, the entire balance may become due immediately.; Other: THERE IS NO GRACE PERIOD. THIS IS A STIPULATED JUDGMENT
  • 05/08/2017
  • STIPULATED JUDGMEN T; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/08/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Rosa Cordova; Filed by: Motorist Acceptance Corp. (Plaintiff)
  • 05/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 03/20/2017
  • Updated -- Jeremiah La Croix (Defendant): Last Name changed from Croix to La Croix; Middle Name: blank
  • 03/16/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Motorist Acceptance Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jeremiah La Croix (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/11/17; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009864 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 05/08/2017
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: Motorist Acceptance Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jeremiah La Croix (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --