HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:18:18

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Wilson Phan against Cindy Thi Luu in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1777
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Tony L. Richardson
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Phan Wilson
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Luu Cindy Thi Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/21/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
6/8/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/27/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/16/2017
6/16/2017: Minute Order of 06/16/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/16/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/27/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/16/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/16/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/16/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/16/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/16/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 06/16/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/16/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Wilson Phan on 03/01/2017: Defendant Cindy Thi Luu does not owe the plaintiff Wilson Phan any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: Court finds no liability, no damages. Judgment for defendant.
  • 06/08/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Wilson Phan (Plaintiff); As to: Cindy Thi Luu (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/06/17; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 04/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/16/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 04/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/16/2017
  • 04/21/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Wilson Phan (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170301E2986 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170301E2986 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Wilson Phan (Plaintiff); As to: Cindy Thi Luu (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --