HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:18:15

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Betty Henderson against Geico Indemnity Company Corporation in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1774
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Enterprise Car Rental Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Henderson Julius
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Geico Ins. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Henderson Betty
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Geico Indemnity Company Corporation Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Enterprise Rent-a-car Company Of L.A. Llc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Geico Indemnity Company Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

by Laura Ward
8/2/2017: by Laura Ward
  Fees Apply
Download
by Devin Anderson
8/2/2017: by Devin Anderson
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/2/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
6/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/5/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/24/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
4/27/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/20/2017
7/20/2017: Minute Order of 07/20/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/14/2017
6/14/2017: Minute Order of 06/14/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
7/20/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/14/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
6/14/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2017
  • Address for Julius Henderson (Plaintiff) updated
  • 08/14/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL As to: Julius Henderson- Notice of Entry of Judgment of 08/22/17; Filed by: As to: Julius Henderson (Plaintiff)
  • 08/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/02/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/02/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 08/02/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/02/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (3rd) filed by Betty Henderson, et al. on 04/27/2017 as follows: Defendants Geico Indemnity Company Corporation; Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of L.A., LLC do not owe the plaintiffs Betty Henderson; Julius Henderson any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: COURT FINDS: Claim barred by the statute of limitations. Plaintiffs waited over 4 years before filing their claim their claim against defendants.
  • 08/02/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Devin Anderson; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of L.A., LLC (Defendant)
  • 08/02/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Laura Ward; Filed by: Geico Indemnity Company Corporation (Defendant)
  • 07/31/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL Julius Henderson, Minute order, 07/21/17; Filed by: As to: Julius Henderson (Plaintiff)
  • 07/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 07/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2017 at 08:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 08/02/2017
  • 07/20/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  • 07/20/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/20/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Betty Henderson (Plaintiff); Julius Henderson (Plaintiff); As to: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of L.A., LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/19/17
  • 06/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/14/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Held - Continued to 08/02/2017
  • 06/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2017 at 08:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 06/14/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $8.00; Balance: $8.00;
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --