HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:21:18

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Bmw Of Monrovia against Kenneth Howard in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1773
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Bmw Of Monrovia
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Howard Kenneth Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/26/2017
4/26/2017: Minute Order of 04/26/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/26/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/26/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 04/26/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/26/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: BMW of Monrovia (Plaintiff); As to: Kenneth Howard (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009849 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --