HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:18:11

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Marie Mcdonald against Cynthia Tello in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1772
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Tello Cynthia Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Yam Carlos Tello Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Mcdonald Marie
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Tello Gaudalupe Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Mcdonald Marie
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Tello Gaudalupe
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Yam Carlos Tello
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Tello Cynthia
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
5/26/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
  Free
Download
[Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits]
8/3/2017: [Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/1/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/7/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/30/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/18/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Small Claims Appeal
7/27/2017: Notice of Small Claims Appeal
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/17/2017
7/17/2017: Minute Order of 07/17/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appea...
7/26/2017: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appe...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
7/17/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)...
9/7/2017: Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)...
7/26/2017: Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)
  • 09/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 09/07/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/07/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 09/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department 1A Held - Continued to 12/19/2017 08:30 AM at 12/19/2017 8:30 AM Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal in Department 1A
  • 09/07/2017
  • Updated -- Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits: Result: Released; Result Date: 09/07/2017
  • 09/07/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Gaudalupe Tello (Defendant)
  • 08/03/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 08/01/2017
  • Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/27/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 07/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department NE2
  • 07/27/2017
  • Case reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A effective 07/27/2017; Reason:
  • 07/27/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)
  • 07/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 07/26/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/26/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 09/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 07/26/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 12/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 07/17/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  • 07/17/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/17/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/26/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Cynthia Tello (Defendant)
  • 05/26/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Appeal - Notice of appeal of small claim- CCP 116.760; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0013175 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 05/26/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 07/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 05/26/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --