HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:18:07

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Joseph Arthur Lopez against Bryant Morales in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1771
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Morales Bryant Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Lopez Joseph Arthur
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Lopez Joseph Arthur
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Morales Bryant
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/17...
8/17/2017: Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/1...
  Free
Download
Unknown
9/8/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/22/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/21/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/10/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
6/12/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/21/2017
6/21/2017: Minute Order of 06/21/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/21/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/26/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
5/15/2017: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
(Ruling on Submitted Matter)
8/17/2017: (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 09/11/2017 ; Status Date changed from 08/17/2017 to 09/11/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 09/11/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 09/11/2017 ; Status Date changed from 09/11/2017 to 09/11/2017
  • 09/08/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Joseph Arthur Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Bryant Morales (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 08/22/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/17/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 08/17/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/17/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/17/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Joseph Arthur Lopez against Defendant Bryant Morales on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Joseph Arthur Lopez on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $10,000.00 and costs of $123.00 for a total of $10,123.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Other: Based on totality of the evidence presented, plaintiff met burden of proof.
  • 08/17/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Defendant's Claim filed by Bryant Morales on 05/15/2017 as follows: Plaintiff Joseph Arthur Lopez does not owe the defendant Bryant Morales any money on defendant's claim.
  • 08/16/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/16/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/16/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 08/16/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 06/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/21/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 RES to 08/16/2017
  • 06/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/16/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 06/12/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Bryant Morales (Defendant); As to: Joseph Arthur Lopez (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/12/17; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 05/15/2017
  • Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Bryant Morales (Defendant); As to: Joseph Arthur Lopez (Plaintiff)
  • 05/15/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0012675 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 05/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Held - Continued to 06/21/2017
  • 05/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 04/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --