HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:20:47

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Vince Barajas against Brandon Au Dds Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1763
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Brandon Au Dds Inc Dba New Vision Dental Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Barajas Vince
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Receipt for Exhibits
4/26/2017: Receipt for Exhibits
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/12/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions
7/6/2017: Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/27/2017
4/27/2017: Minute Order of 04/27/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
4/27/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/26/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
4/26/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2017
  • Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 04/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/27/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/27/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 04/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 04/26/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 04/26/2017
  • Receipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/26/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Violet Villasenor; Filed by: Brandon Au DDS Inc (Defendant)
  • 04/12/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Vince Barajas (Plaintiff); As to: Brandon Au DDS Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/12/17; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Vince Barajas (Plaintiff); As to: Brandon Au DDS Inc (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009836 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --