HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2017 09:31:31

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Sage Covina Chevrolet against Arturo Varela in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1762
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Sage Covina Chevrolet
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Varela Arturo Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/27/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - No Service
4/18/2017: Proof of Service - No Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - No Service
7/18/2017: Proof of Service - No Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/21/2017
6/21/2017: Minute Order of 06/21/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/21/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/10/2017
8/10/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/10/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
4/27/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
6/21/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
(Non-Jury Trial)
8/10/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/10/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/10/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 08/10/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/10/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 07/18/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by:
  • 06/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/21/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/21/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Held - Continued to 08/10/2017
  • 06/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 06/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Ana Cervantes; Filed by: Sage Covina Chevrolet (Plaintiff)
  • 04/27/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Sage Covina Chevrolet (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/21/2017
  • 04/27/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Ana Cervantes; Filed by: Sage Covina Chevrolet (Plaintiff)
  • 04/18/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Sage Covina Chevrolet (Plaintiff); As to: Arturo Varela (Defendant); Costs: 59.50
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sage Covina Chevrolet (Plaintiff); As to: Arturo Varela (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009835 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --