HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:18:03

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Armando Saldana against Maria Camargo in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1758
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Camargo Maria Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Saldana Armando
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 06/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
6/12/2017: Minute Order of 06/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
[Request for Court Order and Answer]
7/12/2017: [Request for Court Order and Answer]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Order on Request for Court Order]
7/27/2017: [Order on Request for Court Order]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
7/27/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/14/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Court Order and Answer
7/12/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer
  Fees Apply
Download
RETURNED MAIL - Maria Camargo, Ntc of Postponement...
4/24/2017: RETURNED MAIL - Maria Camargo, Ntc of Postponemen...
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Postponement
4/14/2017: Notice of Postponement
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/13/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/12/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer
7/21/2017: Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Armando Saldana (Plaintiff)
  • 07/27/2017
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Result: Denied; Result Date: 07/27/2017
  • 07/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/21/2017
  • Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Maria Camargo (Defendant)
  • 07/13/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Armando Saldana (Plaintiff)
  • 07/12/2017
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Status Date changed from 07/13/2017 to 07/12/2017
  • 07/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/13/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/13/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 06/12/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/12/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Armando Saldana on 03/01/2017: Defendant Maria Camargo does not owe the plaintiff Armando Saldana any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: Plaintiff failed to prove by a preponderance of the evidence that he paid the defendant the amounts he claimed. Defendant denied all but one $230 payment. Therefore she cannot be required to release the lien on the plaintiff's vehicle she took as security for the $4,800.00 loan she made to him.
  • 04/25/2017
  • Updated -- RETURNED MAIL Maria Camargo, Ntc of Postponement, 04/14/17: Name Extension changed from Maria Camargo, Minute order, 04/14/17 to Maria Camargo, Ntc of Postponement, 04/14/17
  • 04/24/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL Maria Camargo, Minute order, 04/14/17; Filed by:
  • 04/14/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk
  • 04/14/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Maria Camargo (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
  • 04/14/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0011536 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 04/14/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/14/2017
  • 04/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --