HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:20:30

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Juan Leon against Octavio Cardona in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1757
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Pasadena Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Leon Juan
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Cardona Octavio Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Order on Request for Court Order]
8/18/2017: [Order on Request for Court Order]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Notice of Rejection]
7/27/2017: [Notice of Rejection]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Notice of Rejection]
7/27/2017: [Notice of Rejection]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/18/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/29/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/18/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/9/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/1/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Rejection
6/27/2017: Notice of Rejection
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
4/26/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/1/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 10/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A
  • 08/29/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/29/2017
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A; Reason: Inventory Transfer
  • 08/18/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Juan Leon (Plaintiff)
  • 08/18/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court): Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/18/2017
  • 08/18/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/18/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Issued and Filed by: Juan Leon (Plaintiff); As to: Octavio Cardona (Defendant)
  • 08/15/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Juan Leon (Plaintiff)
  • 08/15/2017
  • Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: Juan Leon (Plaintiff)
  • 07/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/27/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 04/26/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/26/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Juan Leon against Defendant Octavio Cardona on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Juan Leon on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $8,739.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $8,814.00.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $75.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Octavio Cardona. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.
  • 04/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/26/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/09/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Juan Leon (Plaintiff); As to: Octavio Cardona (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/03/17
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Juan Leon (Plaintiff); As to: Octavio Cardona (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Juan Leon (Plaintiff)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --