HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:20:09

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Puente Hills Imports against Steven Martinez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1748
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Annabelle G Cortez
  • Courthouse

    Alhambra Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Puente Hills Imports Dba Puente Hills Toyota
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Martinez Steven Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Assignee

    Transcon Financial Inc.
  • Represented By:

    • Talkov Ronald Benjamin

Court Documents

by Jaime Rodriguez
8/18/2017: by Jaime Rodriguez
  Fees Apply
Download
[Notice of Rejection]
5/18/2017: [Notice of Rejection]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
6/5/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/28/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/30/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Rejection
5/18/2017: Notice of Rejection
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
6/5/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/1/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/26/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacat...
8/18/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vaca...
  Fees Apply
Download
Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims)
3/1/2017: Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2017
  • Assignment of Judgment; Filed by: Transcon Financial Inc. (Assignee); As to: Puente Hills Imports (Plaintiff)
  • 08/18/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 08/18/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/18/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/18/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 08/18/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/18/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Jaime Rodriguez; Filed by: Puente Hills Imports (Plaintiff)
  • 06/13/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0013812 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 06/05/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Steven Martinez (Defendant)
  • 06/05/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2
  • 06/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/18/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk
  • 05/18/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/26/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Puente Hills Imports DBA Puente Hills Toyota against Defendant Steven Martinez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Puente Hills Imports on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $2,000.00 and costs of $104.39 for a total of $2,104.39.
  • 04/26/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Jaime Rodriguez; Filed by: Puente Hills Imports (Plaintiff)
  • 04/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 04/26/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 03/30/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Puente Hills Imports (Plaintiff); As to: Steven Martinez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/20/17; Service Cost: 54.39; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Puente Hills Imports (Plaintiff); As to: Steven Martinez (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009795 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --