This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 09:58:12 (UTC).

MOTORISTS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATI VS VALDEZ, REBECCA

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 MOTORISTS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATI filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VALDEZ, REBECCA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4046

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOTORISTS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION DBA SADDLEBACK ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

CASTANEDA STEPHANIE

VALDEZ REBECCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOELL & ELDER - WILLIAM N. ELDER JR.

Attorney at FOELL & ELDER

ELDER WILLIAM N. JR.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

9/14/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Declaration (name extension) - in Support of Cost of Enforcing Judgment

9/14/2017: Declaration (name extension) - in Support of Cost of Enforcing Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - RE: Accrued Interest Computation

9/14/2017: Declaration (name extension) - RE: Accrued Interest Computation

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

4/18/2018: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

4/18/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

4/18/2018: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

4/15/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Costs After Judgment

4/15/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Costs After Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Accrued Interest

4/15/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO )

4/16/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO )

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO ); Issued by: (MOTORISTS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) (Plaintiff); As to: REBECCA VALDEZ (Defendant); STEPHANIE CASTANEDA (Defendant); County: SACRAMENTO; Principal: 7018.47; Interest: 18.35; Costs: 450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (MOTORISTS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) (Plaintiff); As to: REBECCA VALDEZ (Defendant); STEPHANIE CASTANEDA (Defendant); Costs: 450.00; Interest: 18.35; Credits: 1437.68; Service Date: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Declaration Re: Accrued Interest; Filed by: (MOTORISTS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Declaration in Support of Costs After Judgment; Filed by: (MOTORISTS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 7,018.47; Interest: 565.32; Costs: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (MOTORISTS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) (Plaintiff); Costs: 300.00; Interest: 565.32; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 04/17/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: (MOTORISTS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: (MOTORISTS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Sacramento); Issued by: Clerk; County: Sacramento; Principal: 7,018.47; Interest: 119.04; Costs: 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (MOTORISTS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) (Plaintiff); As to: REBECCA VALDEZ (Defendant); STEPHANIE CASTANEDA (Defendant); Costs: 150.00; Interest: 119.04; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: PRE JUDGMENT INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (VALDEZ, REBECCA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (VALDEZ, REBECCA) ON 03/14/17 BY SERVING LEO RAMOS . COSTS OF $ 46.42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CASTANEDA, STEPHANIE) ON 04/05/17 BY SERVING BOBBY ALTAMIRANO . COSTS OF $ 45.76

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/14/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371035. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CCP 170.6 FILED BY (MOTORISTS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) DBA (SADDLEBACK ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) AS TO HONORABLE THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE .

    Read MoreRead Less