HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:17:42

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Nathali Tlatenchi against Thania Ivette Aceves in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2254
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Michael J. Pearce
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Tlatenchi Anahi
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Morales Pedro Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Tlatenchi Nathali
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Aceves Thania Ivette Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Perez Elena
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/09...
8/9/2017: Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/09...
  Free
Download
Unknown
8/9/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
6/15/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/25/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/24/2017
5/24/2017: Minute Order of 05/24/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/24/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
EXHIBITS RECEIPT
8/16/2017: EXHIBITS RECEIPT
  Fees Apply
Download
(Ruling on Submitted Matter)
8/9/2017: (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
(Non-Jury Trial)
8/8/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2017
  • Other - EXHIBITS RECEIPT; Filed by: Non-Party
  • 08/09/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 08/09/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/09/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/09/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/09/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Elena Perez, Plaintiff Nathali Tlatenchi and Plaintiff Anahi Tlatenchi against Defendant Thania Ivette Aceves on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Nathali Tlatenchi, et al. on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $300.00 and costs of $155.00 for a total of $455.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Other: The Kia belongs to the plaintiffs' father, Francisco Tlatenchi Maldonado, not to the plaintiffs, so he would have to pursue the property damage claim for the deductible. The plaintiffs produced no medical bills or records. The judgment breakdown is as follows: Each plaintiff is awarded $100.00 separately, but are awarded court costs of $155.00, jointly. EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN
  • 08/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 08/08/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 06/15/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Thania Ivette Aceves (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/13/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 05/24/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Nathali Tlatenchi, et al. on 03/03/2017, Order for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to Pedro Morales
  • 05/24/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/24/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued to 08/08/2017
  • 05/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 04/25/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Pedro Morales (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/17/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Nathali Tlatenchi (Plaintiff); Anahi Tlatenchi (Plaintiff); Elena Perez (Plaintiff); As to: Thania Ivette Aceves (Defendant); Pedro Morales (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011633 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --