HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:19:49

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Edgar Becerra against Compton Unified School District in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2250
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Cabada Miguel
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Compton Unified School District Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Becerra Edgar
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Gonzalez Kevin
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Mureillo Michael Daniel Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
6/2/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
5/4/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
5/4/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Other - (name extension) - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT...
7/7/2017: Other - (name extension) - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
6/2/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
6/2/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/07/2017
7/7/2017: Minute Order of 07/07/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/24/2017: Minute Order of 05/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
5/24/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vac...
7/7/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vac...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Compton Unified School District (Defendant)
  • 07/07/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 07/07/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 07/07/2017; Disposition Type: Vacated
  • 07/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/07/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/07/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 07/07/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 07/07/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/07/2017
  • Order for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 07/07/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Edgar Becerra, et al. on 03/03/2017, judgment entered on 05/24/2017 is vacated
  • 07/07/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Edgar Becerra, et al. on 03/03/2017, judgment entered on 05/24/2017 as to Compton Unified School District is vacated
  • 07/07/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Edgar Becerra, et al. on 03/03/2017, judgment entered on 05/24/2017 as to Michael Daniel Mureillo is vacated
  • 07/07/2017
  • Other - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Filed by: Court
  • 06/02/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Michael Daniel Mureillo (Defendant)
  • 06/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0015249 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 06/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 06/02/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Compton Unified School District (Defendant)
  • 06/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0015252 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 06/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 05/24/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/24/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/24/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Edgar Becerra; Plaintiff Kevin Gonzalez; Plaintiff Miguel Cabada against Defendant Michael Daniel Mureillo; Defendant Compton Unified School District on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Edgar Becerra, et al. on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $1,500.00 and costs of $148.00 for a total of $1,648.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.
  • 05/24/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 07/07/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --