HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:17:38

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Angelann Manuel against Candace Dawn Derossett in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2248
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Derossett Candace Dawn Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Manuel Angelann
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 05/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/24/2017: Minute Order of 05/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
Unknown
9/20/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Receipt for Exhibits
6/22/2017: Receipt for Exhibits
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/14/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/24/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Infor...
5/23/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Info...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
5/24/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/22/2017
  • Receipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/24/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/24/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/24/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/24/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Angelann Manuel against Defendant Candace Dawn Derossett on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Angelann Manuel on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $3,500.00 and costs of $125.00 for a total of $3,625.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Other: EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN.
  • 05/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/23/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 05/23/2017
  • Address for Candace Dawn Derossett (Defendant) updated
  • 05/23/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Candace Dawn Derossett (Defendant)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/23/2017
  • 04/14/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Angelann Manuel (Plaintiff); As to: Candace Dawn Derossett (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/04/2017; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Angelann Manuel (Plaintiff); As to: Candace Dawn Derossett (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011611 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --