HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:19:29

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Champion Dodge against Alejandro Herrera in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2243
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Michael J. Pearce
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Herrera Alejandro Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Champion Dodge
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Moreno Susana Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (Amended...
4/26/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (Amende...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/18/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/5/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/25/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Infor...
6/26/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Info...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/25/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/25/2017: Minute Order of 05/25/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
5/25/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/25/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/25/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
6/26/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • Address for SUSANA MORENO (Defendant) updated
  • 06/26/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: SUSANA MORENO (Defendant)
  • 06/26/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: CHAMPION DODGE (Plaintiff); As to: ALEJANDRO HERRERA (Defendant); SUSANA MORENO (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 06/26/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/26/2017 ; Status Date changed from 05/25/2017 to 06/26/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 05/25/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/25/2017
  • 05/25/2017
  • Updated -- Amended Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/25/2017
  • 05/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/25/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/25/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/25/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/25/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff CHAMPION DODGE against Defendant SUSANA MORENO; Defendant ALEJANDRO HERRERA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by CHAMPION DODGE on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $130.00 for a total of $2,630.00.; Other: JUDGMENT BREAKDOWN: Both defendants are jointly and severally liable for $1,200.00 plus Court costs of $130.00. Defendant Susana Moreno only is responsible for the remaining balance of $1,300.00.
  • 05/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  • 05/25/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: CHAMPION DODGE (Plaintiff)
  • 05/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/26/2017
  • Amended Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CHAMPION DODGE (Plaintiff); As to: SUSANA MORENO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/08/2017; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 04/18/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CHAMPION DODGE (Plaintiff); As to: SUSANA MORENO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/08/2017; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 04/05/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CHAMPION DODGE (Plaintiff); As to: ALEJANDRO HERRERA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/10/2017; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: CHAMPION DODGE (Plaintiff); As to: ALEJANDRO HERRERA (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011605 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --