HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/29/2017 09:30:58

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Southern Glazer S Wine Spirits Llc against Moon On Serrano Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2234
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Jeon Erin Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Moon On Serrano Inc. Dba Caffe Concerto Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits Llc
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/29/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/28/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
10/24/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
10/24/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/5/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/30/2017
10/30/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/30/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Carlos Munoz
8/29/2017: Carlos Munoz
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
6/5/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
(Non-Jury Trial)
10/30/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 10/30/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/30/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 10/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 10/30/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 10/30/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 10/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Moon On Serrano Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/03/2017
  • 10/24/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Erin Jeon (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/04/2017; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 08/30/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department SE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party to 10/30/2017 08:30 AM at 10/30/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department SE2
  • 08/29/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Carlos Munoz; Filed by: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits LLC (Plaintiff)
  • 08/29/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk
  • 08/28/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits LLC (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 06/05/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits LLC (Plaintiff)
  • 06/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 09/06/2017
  • 06/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Southern Glazer's Wine & Spirits LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Moon On Serrano Inc. (Defendant); Erin Jeon (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011591 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --