HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2017 09:25:07

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Elizabeth Rivera against Jose Lopez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2233
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Lopez Jose Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Rivera Elizabeth
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service
6/21/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/17/2017
8/17/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/17/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
(Non-Jury Trial)
8/17/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
(Non-Jury Trial)
10/26/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/17/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/17/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/17/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department SE2 Held - Continued to 10/26/2017 01:30 PM at 10/26/2017 1:30 PM Non-Jury Trial in Department SE2
  • 06/21/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ELIZABETH RIVERA (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE LOPEZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/07/2017; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 06/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 08/17/2017
  • 05/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ELIZABETH RIVERA (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE LOPEZ (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011590 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --