HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:18:59

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Dena Miller against Grace Boksoon Kang in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2230
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Michael J. Pearce
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Yates Derrick Allen Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Kang Grace Boksoon Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Miller Dena
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
9/20/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Receipt for Exhibits
7/14/2017: Receipt for Exhibits
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Other - (name extension) - STATEMENT OF DECISION
5/26/2017: Other - (name extension) - STATEMENT OF DECISION
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/26/2017
5/26/2017: Minute Order of 05/26/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
5/26/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/24/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/14/2017
  • Receipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 05/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/26/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/26/2017
  • Order for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 05/26/2017
  • Other - STATEMENT OF DECISION; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/24/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/24/2017
  • 05/24/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/24/2017
  • 05/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/24/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 03/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: DENA MILLER (Plaintiff); As to: GRACE BOKSOON KANG (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/13/2017
  • 03/21/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Result: blank
  • 03/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: DENA MILLER (Plaintiff); As to: DERRICK ALLEN YATES (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/19/2017
  • 03/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 03/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 05/24/2017
  • 03/06/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Result: Clerical Correction
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: DENA MILLER (Plaintiff); As to: GRACE BOKSOON KANG (Defendant); DERRICK ALLEN YATES (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011584 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --