HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:18:49

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Brian K Scott against Pearlean Scott in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2227
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Scott Pearlean Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Scott Brian K.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service
5/23/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Other - (name extension) - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT...
5/23/2017: Other - (name extension) - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMEN...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/23/2017
5/23/2017: Minute Order of 05/23/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6
  • 05/23/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Brian K. Scott (Plaintiff); As to: Pearlean Scott (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/17/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 05/23/2017
  • Other - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Filed by: Brian K. Scott (Plaintiff); Pearlean Scott (Defendant)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/23/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/23/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Brian K. Scott (Plaintiff); As to: Pearlean Scott (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011580 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --