HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:18:46

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Michael Sier against Grace Boksoon Kang in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2226
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Michael J. Pearce
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Yates Derrick Allen Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Sier Michael
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Kang Grace Boksoon Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Miller Dena
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Notice of Rejection]
8/21/2017: [Notice of Rejection]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Notice of Rejection]
7/13/2017: [Notice of Rejection]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
7/31/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Other - (name extension) - STATEMENT OF DECISION
6/9/2017: Other - (name extension) - STATEMENT OF DECISION
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Small Claims Appeal
6/22/2017: Notice of Small Claims Appeal
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Rejection
7/13/2017: Notice of Rejection
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/9/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
6/22/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/24/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)...
8/4/2017: Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: DENA MILLER (Plaintiff)
  • 08/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 08/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)
  • 08/04/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 08/04/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/04/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 08/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 08/04/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/31/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: MICHAEL SIER (Plaintiff); DENA MILLER (Plaintiff); As to: GRACE BOKSOON KANG (Defendant); DERRICK ALLEN YATES (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 07/31/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 07/31/2017 ; Status Date changed from 06/09/2017 to 07/31/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 07/31/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 07/31/2017 ; Status Date changed from 07/31/2017 to 07/31/2017
  • 07/13/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk
  • 07/13/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 06/22/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: GRACE BOKSOON KANG (Defendant); DERRICK ALLEN YATES (Defendant)
  • 06/22/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Appeal - Notice of appeal of small claim- CCP 116.760; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0016115 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 06/22/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 08/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 06/22/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Issued by: Clerk
  • 06/09/2017
  • Other - STATEMENT OF DECISION; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/09/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 06/09/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/09/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/09/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/09/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff MICHAEL SIER; Plaintiff DENA MILLER against Defendant GRACE BOKSOON KANG; Defendant DERRICK ALLEN YATES on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MICHAEL SIER on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $8,800.00 and costs of $175.00 for a total of $8,975.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.
  • 05/26/2017
  • ** Case Name changed from MICHAEL SIER vs GRACE BOKSOON KANG to MICHAEL SIER, et al. vs GRACE BOKSOON KANG
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --