HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:17:17

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Yolanda Peoples against Da Yana Fuller in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2220
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Michael J. Pearce
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Fuller Da'yana Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Peoples Yolanda
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/23/2017: Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
[Request for Court Order and Answer]
6/1/2017: [Request for Court Order and Answer]
  Fees Apply
Download
Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)
7/25/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
10/10/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
10/10/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/20/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Court Order and Answer
6/1/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer
  Fees Apply
Download
Receipt for Exhibits
7/14/2017: Receipt for Exhibits
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/3/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request for Court Order
6/13/2017: Order on Request for Court Order
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim; Filed by: YOLANDA PEOPLES (Plaintiff); As to: DA'YANA FULLER (Defendant)
  • 10/10/2017
  • Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 10/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 10/10/2017
  • Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption; Filed by: YOLANDA PEOPLES (Plaintiff)
  • 09/20/2017
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/25/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: YOLANDA PEOPLES (Plaintiff); As to: DA'YANA FULLER (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 50.92
  • 07/25/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles; Principal: 2,950.00; Interest: 50.92
  • 07/14/2017
  • Receipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/13/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Court
  • 06/01/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: YOLANDA PEOPLES (Plaintiff)
  • 06/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/23/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/23/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff YOLANDA PEOPLES against Defendant DA'YANA FULLER on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by YOLANDA PEOPLES on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $2,875.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $2,950.00.; Other: EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN
  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/23/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: YOLANDA PEOPLES (Plaintiff); As to: DA'YANA FULLER (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/01/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: YOLANDA PEOPLES (Plaintiff); As to: DA'YANA FULLER (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011571 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --