HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:17:13

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Linda Campf against Loyalty Construction Inc A California Corporation in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2219
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Campf David
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Loyalty Construction Inc. A California Corporation Dba Solar 123 Construction Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Gavriely Liat Dba Loyalty Construction Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Gavriely Roi Dba Loyalty Construction Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Campf Linda
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 05/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/22/2017: Minute Order of 05/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
6/1/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
  Free
Download
[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
6/1/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
  Free
Download
Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vac...
7/7/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vac...
  Free
Download
[Request for Court Order and Answer, Request for C...
7/20/2017: [Request for Court Order and Answer, Request for ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Court Order and Answer
7/20/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/8/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/8/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
ORDER
8/1/2017: ORDER
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Court Order) of 08/01/2017
8/1/2017: Minute Order (Court Order) of 08/01/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer
7/27/2017: Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Linda Campf (Plaintiff)
  • 10/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 09/08/2017
  • Other - EXHIBITS RECEIPT; Filed by: Non-Party
  • 09/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 09/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/05/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/05/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/05/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Linda Campf, et al. on 03/01/2017 as follows: Defendants Liat GAVRIELY DBA Loyalty Construction; LOYALTY CONSTRUCTION, INC., A California Corporation DBA Solar 123 Construction; ROI GAVRIELY DBA Loyalty Construction do not owe the plaintiffs Linda Campf; David Campf any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN.
  • 09/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: LOYALTY CONSTRUCTION, INC., A California Corporation (Defendant)
  • 09/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Denial of Motion to Vacate)
  • 09/01/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 09/01/2017
  • 09/01/2017
  • Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Denial of Motion to Vacate scheduled for 09/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 09/01/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 09/01/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Linda Campf, et al. on 03/01/2017, judgment entered on 05/22/2017 is vacated
  • 09/01/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Linda Campf, et al. on 03/01/2017, judgment entered on 05/22/2017 as to LOYALTY CONSTRUCTION, INC., A California Corporation is vacated
  • 09/01/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Linda Campf, et al. on 03/01/2017, judgment entered on 05/22/2017 as to Liat GAVRIELY is vacated
  • 09/01/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Linda Campf, et al. on 03/01/2017, judgment entered on 05/22/2017 as to ROI GAVRIELY is vacated
  • 08/14/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Request for Court Order: Result: Granted
  • 08/04/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order, Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 08/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)
  • 08/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 08/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/01/2017
  • Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Denial of Motion to Vacate scheduled for 09/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --