HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:18:09

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by City Of Long Beach against Lisa Nilsson in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2215
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    City Of Long Beach
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Nilsson Lisa Aka Lisa Ann Nilsson Aka Lisa Ann Lamazzi Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Notice of Rejection]
7/10/2017: [Notice of Rejection]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
6/22/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarat...
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/4/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/19/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Rejection
7/10/2017: Notice of Rejection
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
6/22/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/22/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/22/2017: Minute Order of 05/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacat...
8/4/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacat...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: City of Long Beach (Plaintiff)
  • 08/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 08/04/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 08/04/2017
  • 08/04/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/04/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/04/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 08/04/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/04/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6
  • 08/04/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by City of Long Beach on 03/01/2017, judgment entered on 05/22/2017 is vacated
  • 08/04/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by City of Long Beach on 03/01/2017, judgment entered on 05/22/2017 as to Lisa Nilsson is vacated
  • 08/04/2017
  • Other - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Filed by: City of Long Beach (Plaintiff); Lisa Nilsson (Defendant)
  • 07/10/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk
  • 07/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 06/22/2017
  • Address for Lisa Nilsson (Defendant) updated
  • 06/22/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Lisa Nilsson (Defendant)
  • 06/22/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0016135 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 06/22/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 06/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/23/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: City of Long Beach (Plaintiff)
  • 05/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/22/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/22/2017; Result Type to Held
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --