HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:17:59

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Maria Vasquez against Juan Martinez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2211
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Martinez Juan Dba L.i.s. Cleaners Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Vasquez Maria
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgme...
6/21/2017: [Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgm...
  Fees Apply
Download
Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgmen...
6/21/2017: Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgme...
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Pay Judgment to Court
6/21/2017: Request to Pay Judgment to Court
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
5/12/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/23/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/23/2017: Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds
7/10/2017: Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/22/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2017
  • Transfer Amount = $131.07; Receipt # : STRM-2017-0001049-1; From : 17DWSC02211; To :
  • 07/17/2017
  • Refund Requested - $131.07
  • 07/17/2017
  • Refund Approved - $131.07
  • 07/13/2017
  • Refund Requested - $131.07
  • 07/10/2017
  • Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: MARIA VASQUEZ (Plaintiff)
  • 06/21/2017
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: JUAN MARTINEZ (Defendant)
  • 06/21/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Pay Jdgmt to Court Fee-Pmt of jdgmt to ct-CCP 116.860; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0016080 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 06/21/2017
  • Trust Deposit: Civil Trust Account; Amount: $131.07 Receipt: DW-2017-0016080 (Credit Card); Party: JUAN MARTINEZ (Defendant)
  • 06/21/2017
  • Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/21/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/21/2017 ; Status Date changed from 05/23/2017 to 06/21/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 06/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 06/21/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/21/2017 ; Status Date changed from 06/21/2017 to 06/21/2017
  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/23/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/23/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff MARIA VASQUEZ against Defendant JUAN MARTINEZ INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA L.I.S. CLEANERS on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MARIA VASQUEZ on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $100.00 and costs of $30.00 for a total of $130.00.
  • 05/22/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: JUAN MARTINEZ (Defendant)
  • 05/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/22/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/22/2017
  • 05/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/22/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --