This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2020 at 20:45:55 (UTC).

RUBY OREJEL VS CITY OF COMPTON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 RUBY OREJEL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CITY OF COMPTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2196

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OREJEL RUBY

Burbank, CA 91504

TORRES GUADALUPE

Burbank, CA 91504

Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF COMPTON

Compton, CA 90220

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

3/3/2017: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

9/20/2017: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Receipt for Exhibits

6/22/2017: Receipt for Exhibits

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/23/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/23/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

5/23/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Other - (name extension) - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

5/22/2017: Other - (name extension) - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/22/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/22/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Subpoena & Proof of Service - no docs

4/26/2017: Subpoena & Proof of Service - no docs

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/26/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Subpoena & Proof of Service - no docs

4/21/2017: Subpoena & Proof of Service - no docs

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/17/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketReceipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Ruby Orejel, a minor by and through Guardian Ad Litem, Guadalupe Torres; Plaintiff Guadalupe Torres against Defendant City of Compton on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ruby Orejel on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $3,500.00 and costs of $0.00 for a total of $3,500.00.; Other: EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $195.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant City of Compton. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 04/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketSubpoena & Proof of Service no docs; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: County of Los Angeles (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 04/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by: Guadalupe Torres (Plaintiff); As to: Ruby Orejel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ruby Orejel (Plaintiff); As to: City of Compton (Defendant); County of Los Angeles (Defendant); City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Ruby Orejel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Ruby Orejel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011542 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less