HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:17:03

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Ricky Webb against Thurmanesha Necole Simon in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2195
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Simon Thurmanesha Necole Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Webb Ricky
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/16/2017 and Ju...
8/16/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/16/2017 and J...
  Free
Download
Unknown
8/16/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/16/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/24/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
4/17/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/22/2017
5/22/2017: Minute Order of 05/22/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
(Non-Jury Trial)
8/16/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2017
  • Address for Ricky Webb (Plaintiff) updated
  • 08/16/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Ricky Webb (Plaintiff)
  • 08/16/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/16/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/16/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/16/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/16/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/16/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 08/16/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/16/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Ricky Webb against Defendant Thurmanesha Necole Simon on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ricky Webb on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $3,483.57 and costs of $80.00 for a total of $3,563.57.
  • 05/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/22/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/22/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Balance: $10.00;
  • 05/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued to 08/16/2017
  • 05/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/16/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 04/24/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Thurmanesha Necole Simon (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/20/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes
  • 04/24/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result: Granted by Operation of Law; Result Date: 04/24/2017
  • 04/17/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees
  • 04/17/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: As to: Ricky Webb (Plaintiff)
  • 04/17/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees
  • 04/17/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result changed from Granted by Operation of Law to Granted; Result Date changed from 04/24/2017 to 04/17/2017
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ricky Webb (Plaintiff); As to: Thurmanesha Necole Simon (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011541 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --