HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:17:03

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Tomas D Menjivar against Hammed Mahadi in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2193
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Menjivar Tomas D.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Mahadi Hammed Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

orap
9/15/2017: orap
  Fees Apply
Download
no docs
9/15/2017: no docs
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/24/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/20/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
7/20/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
5/22/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/22/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Infor...
7/18/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Info...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/22/2017: Minute Order of 05/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2017
  • Subpoena & Proof of Service no docs; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Hammed Mahadi (Defendant)
  • 09/15/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) orap; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Hammed Mahadi (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 09/13/2017
  • 08/24/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Hammed Mahadi (Defendant)
  • 08/24/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 10/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 07/24/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court): Result: Granted
  • 07/20/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/18/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Tomas D. Menjivar (Plaintiff)
  • 07/18/2017
  • Address for Tomas D. Menjivar (Plaintiff) updated
  • 07/18/2017
  • Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court)
  • 05/22/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/22/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/22/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/22/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Tomas D. Menjivar against Defendant Hammed Mahadi on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tomas D. Menjivar on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $2,600.00 and costs of $0.00 for a total of $2,600.00.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $50.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Hammed Mahadi. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.
  • 05/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/20/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Tomas D. Menjivar (Plaintiff); As to: Hammed Mahadi (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/17/2017
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tomas D. Menjivar (Plaintiff); As to: Hammed Mahadi (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Tomas D. Menjivar (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Tomas D. Menjivar (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011539 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --