HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:16:46

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Albertina Salinas against Jorge Alberto Benegas Zuniga in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2188
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Benegas Zuniga Jorge Alberto Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Salinas Albertina
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/13/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
5/25/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/25/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/25/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/25/2017: Minute Order of 05/25/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/25/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/25/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/25/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/25/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/25/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff ALBERTINA SALINAS against Defendant JORGE ALBERTO BENEGAS ZUNIGA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by ALBERTINA SALINAS on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $6,600.00 and costs of $0.00 for a total of $6,600.00.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $75.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant JORGE ALBERTO BENEGAS ZUNIGA. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.
  • 05/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/25/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/13/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: ALBERTINA SALINAS (Plaintiff); As to: JORGE ALBERTO BENEGAS ZUNIGA (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/03/2017
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ALBERTINA SALINAS (Plaintiff); As to: JORGE ALBERTO BENEGAS ZUNIGA (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ALBERTINA SALINAS (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: ALBERTINA SALINAS (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011528 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/25/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --